Sivapalan, Sivaseelan (CPSO#: 92983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Manchester, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12295 Highway 50
Suite 207
Bolton ON  L7E1M2
Phone: (905) 857-8855
Fax: (905) 857-7249
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1955 Valley Farm Road
Pickering,
L1V 3R8
Pickering ON  L1V 3R8
Canada
Phone: 905 831 2522
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sivaseelan Sivapalan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sivapalan ( CPSO# 92983 )

Business Address:
1955 Valley Farm Road
Pickering ON  L1V 3R8
Phone Number: (905) 831-2522

Business Address:
Suite 207
12295 Highway 50
Bolton ON  L7E 1M2
Phone Number: (905) 857-8855

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIVASEELAN SIVAPALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAPALAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012