Sivaskandarajah, Gavasker Arulmaran (CPSO#: 113865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 2018

Expiry Date:  08 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Elective as of 12 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Endocrinology
and Metabolism
20 Grosvenor St
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAVASKER ARULMARAN SIVASKANDARAJAH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SIVASKANDARAJAH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. SIVASKANDARAJAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SIVASKANDARAJAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SIVASKANDARAJAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. SIVASKANDARAJAH is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. SIVASKANDARAJAH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 08 Apr 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 06 Nov 2017 to 19 Nov 2017
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2017 to 17 Dec 2017
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Mar 2018 to 08 Apr 2018
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2018