Sivasubramanian, Velan (CPSO#: 66578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aberfoyle Health Centre
Unit 102
304 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M9B 6E2
Phone: (416) 231-7968
Fax: (416) 231-7982
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VELAN SIVASUBRAMANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVASUBRAMANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998