Sivucha, Gregory Arthur James (CPSO#: 70242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box #29, 1015 Ironwork Passage
Vancouver BC  V6H 3R4
Phone: (778) 846-0200
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

368 College St. North
Durham, Ontario
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Canada
Phone: (519) 369-2510
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY ARTHUR JAMES SIVUCHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVUCHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1999