Sjodin, Astrid Dawn (CPSO#: 66880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone: (905) 604-3336
Fax: (905) 604-7750
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Sjodin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sjodin ( CPSO# 66880 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone Number: (905) 604-3336

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASTRID DAWN SJODIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SJODIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 28 Aug 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 10 Dec 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1995