Skalenda, Patrick Joseph (CPSO#: 67092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Runnymede Healthcare Centre
625 Runnymede Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3
Canada
Phone: (416) 762-7316
Fax: (416) 762-3836
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK JOSEPH SKALENDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKALENDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995