Skaro, Anton Ivan (CPSO#: 80574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Room C4 211
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32904
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anton I. Skaro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Skaro ( CPSO# 80574 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Room C4-211
339 Windermere
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTON IVAN SKARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKARO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016