Skarratt, Kevin Henry (CPSO#: 78205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Services
2075 Bayview Ave.
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Dr.
Georgetown, ON
L7G 2B8
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin H. Skarratt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Skarratt ( CPSO# 78205 )

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Services
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN HENRY SKARRATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKARRATT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004