Skeete, Jason Robin (CPSO#: 97450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kipling Heights Medical Centre
Unit 117
2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9W 4L6
Phone: (416) 741-4545
Fax: (416) 744-1484
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pape Medical Centre
751 Pape Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3T1
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-1822
Fax: (416) 778-8779
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason R. Skeete Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Skeete ( CPSO# 97450 )

Business Address:
Kipling Heights Medical Centre
Suite 117
2291 Kipling Avenue
Toronto ON  M9W 4L6
Phone Number: (416) 741-4545

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Oct 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Jason Robin Skeete may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.