Skehan, Anthony Michael (CPSO#: 67689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
C/O Operating Room Desk
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Skehan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Skehan ( CPSO# 67689 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc. Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 07 Feb 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 6, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 15, 2012, Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre notified the College that Dr. Anthony Michael Skehan's privileges were restricted, effective September 6, 2011.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 28 May 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY MICHAEL SKEHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKEHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2000