Skeldon, Sean Christopher Toshiaki (CPSO#: 93564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Summerville Family Health Team
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 211
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 621-9700
Fax: (416) 621-4438
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Patient Networks
157 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Canada
Phone: (416) 362-8822
Fax: (416) 362-8877
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Skeldon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Skeldon ( CPSO# 93564 )

Business Address:
Summerville Family Health Team
Suite 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 621-9700

Business Address:
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 362-8822

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jan 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN CHRISTOPHER TOSHIAKI SKELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKELDON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2017