Skene, David Sydney (CPSO#: 19232)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 20 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016