Skillings, Jamey Reta (CPSO#: 28258)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2005