Skipper, Robert James (CPSO#: 57108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 204
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 820-2016
Fax: (905) 820-9008
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Skipper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Skipper ( CPSO# 57108 )

Business Address:
204 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 820-2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES SKIPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKIPPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1991