Sklar, Cindy Michelle (CPSO#: 90644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 445
125 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E4J8
Phone: (519) 822-1888
Fax: (519) 822 0788
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY MICHELLE SKLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKLAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014