Skocylak, George William (CPSO#: 25693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Jan 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
2299 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 1X7
Phone: (416) 766-7610
Fax: (416) 766-5398
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 1972 to 14 Jun 1973
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2005
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 15 Apr 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 17 Aug 2006

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2005 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 11, 2005, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians
            and Surgeons of Ontario imposes the following terms, conditions and limitations
            on the certificate of registration held by Dr. George William Skocylak:

                  a)    that Dr. Skocylak's privileges to prescribe narcotics or controlled
                        drugs are suspended;
                  
                  b)    that Dr. Skocylak prominently display a sign in his office(s)
                        advising his patients of his suspension of privileges to prescribe
                        narcotics and controlled drugs; and
                  
                  c)    that in the event that Dr. Skocylak fails to comply with any of the
                        terms of the Discipline Committee's Order, his certificate of
                        registration shall be immediately suspended for the remainder of
                        the six-month period.
                  

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Mar 2006
Summary:

 On March 24, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Skocylak to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct in that he had engaged in conduct or an act relavant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, in that he contravened a term, condition or 
 limitation on his certificate of registration by prescribing drugs with a controlled drug content 
 to a patient in contravention of a Discipline Committee order prohibiting him from doing so.

The 
 Discipline Committee directed and ordered that:  

1.	Dr. Skocylak's certificate of registration 
 be suspended for a period of 4 months commencing on April 17, 2006.

2.	Dr. Skocylak be subject to 
 quarterly random chart reviews for 2 years at his own expense, by a member of the College, 
 approved by the Registrar.

3.	The previously ordered terms, conditions and limitation imposed by 
 the Discipline Committee on January 10, 2005 will remain in effect as follows:

i.	Dr. Skocylak(s 
 privileges to prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs be suspended; and

ii.	Dr. Skocylak 
 prominently display a sign in his office advising his patients of his suspension in privileges to 
 prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 24, 2006


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jan 2005
Summary:

On January 10, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Skocylak to have committed acts of 
professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and that 
he failed to maintain the standard of practice by failing to honour an undertaking given to the College to surrender his 
privileges to prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs.    As well, Dr. Skocylak mailed post-dated prescriptions to a patient for 
medication with either a narcotic or a controlled drug content.    
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following: 
 
1)    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Skocylak s certificate of 
      registration for a period of six (6) months, four (4) months of which shall be suspended 
      upon Dr. Skocylak s successful completion of the College s Medical Ethics and Informed 
      Consent course by no later than April 14, 2005 and the College s Physicians  Prescribing  
      Skills course by no later than April 14, 2005. 
 
2)    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to commence the suspension of Dr. 
      Skocylak s certificate of registration on February 14, 2005.  
 
3)    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions 
      and limitations on Dr. Skocylak s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of 
      time: 
 
      a)    that Dr. Skocylak s privileges to prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs be  
      suspended; 
      b)    that Dr. Skocylak prominently display a sign in his office(s) advising his patients  
      of his suspension in privileges to prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs; and 
      c)    that in the event that Dr. Skocylak fails to comply with any of the terms of this  
      Order, his certificate of registration shall be immediately suspended for the  
      remainder of the six (6) month period. 
 
4.    The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the 
      register. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 10, 2005