Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Skory, Leah Michaelle (CPSO#: 69408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Barrie Community Health Centre
Eagle Ridge Professional Complex
490 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 734-9690
Fax: (705) 734-0239
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webber Skory Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Webber ( CPSO# 68261 )
Dr. L. Skory ( CPSO# 69408 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
490 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 734-9690

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEAH MICHAELLE SKORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKORY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1998