Skouras, Nicholas (CPSO#: 65480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1108
20 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1K8
Phone: (416) 590-0445
Fax: (416) 590-0446
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Skouras Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Skouras ( CPSO# 65480 )

Business Address:
Suite 1108
20 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1K8
Phone Number: (416) 590-0445

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS SKOURAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKOURAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993