Skrobik, Yoanna Krystyna (CPSO#: 54479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Montreal, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Davies 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1001 Blvd. Décarie
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Opus Clinic
1470 Peel suite 850
Montreal QC  H3A 1T1
Canada
Phone: (514) 787-6787
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yoanna Skrobik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 22 2015


Corporation Name: Yoanna Skrobik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Skrobik ( CPSO# 54479 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Davies 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOANNA KRYSTYNA SKROBIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKROBIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013