Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Skuy, Beth Joanne (CPSO#: 56874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 34
462 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1N8
Phone: (416) 698-9988
Fax: (416) 698-1055
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edgerley Skuy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Edgerley ( CPSO# 56753 )
Dr. B. Skuy ( CPSO# 56874 )

Business Address:
Unit 34
462 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1K 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 698-9988

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETH JOANNE SKUY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKUY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987