Sky, Anastasia (CPSO#: 58255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Dec 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
217 Governor's Road
Dundas ON  L9H 3J7
Phone: (905) 531-7028
Fax: (905) 628-5595
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anastasia Sky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sky ( CPSO# 58255 )

Business Address:
217 Governor's Road
Dundas ON  L9H 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 531-7028

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1991
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 1991

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 1991 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Anastasia Sky may not prescribe nor possess any Benzodiazepines or their
            congeners, as contained in Schedule F of the Food and Drugs Act (Canada) for
            the purpose of her medical practice.