Sky, Kenneth (CPSO#: 21311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1968

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100-1525 Albion Road
Rexdale ON  M9V 5G5
Phone: (416) 746 4968
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1315 Finch Ave. W.
suite 403
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 636-1166
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 18, 2009
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On November 5, 2009, William Osler Heatlh Centre notified the College that Dr. Kenneth Sky's privileges will be suspended from November 18, 2009 to December 17, 2009.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH SKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1968