Slaney, Nathalie Marie Caroline (CPSO#: 88514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
130 ELM STREET
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T6
Phone: (705) 222-2741
Fax: (705) 222-7293
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1028 Southbay Road
Sudbury ON
Sudbury ON  P3E 6J7
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Slaney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Slaney ( CPSO# 88514 )

Business Address:
Maison Vale Hospice
1028 Southbay Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6J7
Phone Number: (705) 674-9252

Business Address:
130 Elm Street
Suite 200
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T6
Phone Number: (705) 222-2741

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE MARIE CAROLINE SLANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLANEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011