Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Slaughter, David Norman (CPSO#: 24445)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: North York General Hospital,4001 Leslie Street, Toronto, ON M2K 1E1 and Credit Valley Hospital, 2200 Eglinton Avenue West, Mississauga, ON L5M 2N1
Date Received: 29 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Apr 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015