Slawik, Simone (CPSO#: 85566)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ruhr Universitaet Bochum, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Aug 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2006 to 14 Feb 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2007