Slechta, Vaclav Antonin (CPSO#: 23944)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Russian

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking for a copy of their records should call (905) 770-2438.
Date Received: 04 Nov 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007