Slesar, Stephan Joseph (CPSO#: 17722)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1961
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Apr 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2001