Slesers, Aris (CPSO#: 21453)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: April 30, 2004
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On April 30, 2004, Dr. Aris Slesers undertook to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
Ontario the following,
-- that he has ceased to practise medicine and will not practise medicine in any jurisdiction.