Slevin, John Charles (CPSO#: 78392)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005