Slezic, Ivo (CPSO#: 25389)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I Slezic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Trillium Health Centre 6660 Kennedy, Mississauga ON L5T 2M9
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  April 1, 2013
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 6, 2013, Trillium Health Partners notified the College that Dr. Slezic privileges were restricted, efffective April 1, 2013.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2017