Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Slinger, Katherine Ann (CPSO#: 58579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
586 Argus Road
Oakville ON  L6J 3J3
Phone: (905) 842-2410
Fax: (905) 842-7376
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.A. Slinger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Slinger ( CPSO# 58579 )

Business Address:
586 Argus Road
Oakville ON  L6J 3J3
Phone Number: (905) 842-2410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ANN SLINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLINGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988