Slinger, Robert William (CPSO#: 62264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2651
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Slinger-Morson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Morson ( CPSO# 62184 )
Dr. R. Slinger ( CPSO# 62264 )

Business Address:
C H E O
3035 - 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT WILLIAM SLINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 1996 to 30 Aug 1996
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1996