Slingerland, Joyce Marie (CPSO#: 52922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UM Sylvester Comprehensive
Cancer Center
Suite 3300 D8-4
1475 North West 12th Avenue
Miami FL  33136
United States
Phone: (305) 243-1542
Fax: (305) 243-8537

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 08 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE MARIE SLINGERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLINGERLAND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1985