Slivchak, Jane Anne Marie (CPSO#: 79108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fort William Clinic
Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1269
Fax: (807) 623-2316
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane Slivchak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Slivchak ( CPSO# 79108 )

Business Address:
1260 Golf Links Road
Suite 201
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ANNE MARIE SLIVCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLIVCHAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005