Sliwin, Sammy Joe (CPSO#: 51783)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 27 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1985
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 01 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2015
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 27 Mar 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Sep 2013
Summary:

On September 11, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sammy Joe Sliwin committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual abuse of a patient, and in that 
he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to 
all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable 
or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Sliwin had a sexual relationship with his patient, Ms A, during the currency of a doctor-
patient relationship. This sexual relationship, which included sexual intercourse, constitutes 
sexual abuse of a patient under section 51(1)(b.1) of the Code. 
 
Dr. Sliwin failed to maintain proper boundaries with Ms A over the long period he was her 
physician. The Committee found this to be disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional 
conduct.  
 
Following a contested penalty hearing that took place on June 13, 2014, on April 1, 2015, the 
Discipline Committee released its penalty decision. The Discipline Committee ordered and 
directed that: 
 
   1. the Registrar revoke Dr. Sliwin’s certificate of registration, effective immediately; 
   2. Dr. Sliwin appear before the panel to be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be 
      recorded on the register. 
 
At the penalty hearing, the Committee heard a constitutional motion brought by Dr. Sliwin.   
 
The Discipline Committee rejected Dr. Sliwin’s constitutional argument that the mandatory 
revocation provisions of the Health Professions Procedural Code were not intended to apply to 
“pre-existing relationships” and noted that in any event Dr. Sliwin had been Patient A’s 
physician even before the start of their sexual relationship. The Committee accepted that 
mandatory revocation as set out in the Code is an appropriate means to deal with the very real 
problem of sexual abuse of patients by physicians and to ensure protection of the public from 
such abuse. The Committee held that the mandatory revocation provisions do not violate either 
section 7 (which provides that everyone has the right to life, liberty, and security of the person 
and the right not to be deprived thereof, except in accordance with the principles of fundamental 
justice) or section 15 (the equality provisions) of the Charter of Rights and Freedoms. As a 
result, the Committee found that the mandatory revocation provisions were constitutional and 
indeed applicable to Dr. Sliwin.   
 
On April 2, 2015, Dr. Sliwin appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Superior 
Court of Justice (Divisional Court). 
 
On April 2, 2015, Dr. Sliwin made a motion to the Divisional Court to stay the order of the 
Discipline Committee pending the appeal. 
 
On April 8, 2015, the Divisional Court ordered that Dr. Sliwin’s revocation be stayed and that he 
be permitted to practise pending the appeal. 
 
On February 1, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered that: 
-  Dr. Sliwin pay costs to the College in the amount of $48,140.00 within 30 days of the date of 
   this Order. 
-  Dr. Sliwin is required to reimburse the College for funding that may be provided to the 
   complainant under the College’s program that provides funding for therapy or counselling for 
   persons who, while patients, were sexually abused by members; and to post an irrevocable 
   letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within 30 days of the date of this 
   Order, in the amount of $16,060.00, to guarantee the payment of any amounts he may be 
   required to reimburse for funding provided to the complainant under the program required 
   under section 85.7 of the Code. 
 
On March 27, 2017, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Sliwin’s appeal, except that the Court 
vacated the Committee’s order of February 1, 2016 to provide security for therapy or counseling 
costs.Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee, except for the order to provide 
security for therapy or counseling costs, is in effect.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Notice of Appeal
Appeal Decision Date: 27 Mar 2017
Hearing Date(s): June 6-8,June 18-22, 2012