Sloan, Ian Alexander Jeremy (CPSO#: 17736)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Sloan, Ian Alexander (used until: 31 Mar 2004 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Sloan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Headache and Pain Relief Clinic Suite 220 251 Consumers Road Toronto ON M2J 4R3
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Dec 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016