Sloane, John Andrews (CPSO#: 19919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
3313 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2L9
Phone: (416) 925-7791
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ANDREWS SLOANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLOANE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1972