Slow, Elizabeth Jane (CPSO#: 88575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Movement Disorders Clinic
7MCl-406
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6422
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JANE SLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 30 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2014