Sluzar, Markian Roman (CPSO#: 52566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Springwater ON  L9X 0T2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46550
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Markian Sluzar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sluzar ( CPSO# 52566 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 16, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 11, 2014, Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Markian R. Sluzar's privileges were restricted, effective June 16, 2014.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 28 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 28, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Markian Roman Sluzar,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sluzar to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. MARKIAN ROMAN SLUZAR
                                          ("Dr. Sluzar")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                                                                                     
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Sluzar, certificate of registration number 52566, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information respecting my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Sluzar, acknowledge that my practice has been limited to surgical
                  assist at Royal Victoria Hospital, Barrie, Ontario since September 2014.

            (4)   I, Dr. Sluzar, acknowledge that I have informed the College that I do not
                  practice at any location other than Royal Victoria Hospital, Barrie,
                  Ontario, nor do I have privileges at any other hospital whatsoever.

            B.    UNDERTAKING


            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sluzar, undertake that I shall not engage in the practice of
                        medicine as the Most Responsible Physician for any patient(s)
                        whatsoever.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sluzar, undertake that the entirety of my scope of practice
                        will be restricted in the following ways:
                  
                        (i)   I shall only practise medicine as a surgical assistant of a
                              surgeon:
                  
                              a.    certified by the Royal College of Physicians and
                                    Surgeons or recognized as a surgical specialist by the
                                    College; and
                  
                              b.    who holds privileges at the Royal Victoria Hospital, or
                                    other Practice Location as may be approved by the
                                    College (collectively, a "Qualified Surgeon")
                  
                        (ii)  for further clarity, but without limiting the generality of
                              section (5)(b)(i) above:
                  
                              a.    I will not provide any pre-operative or post-operative
                                    care whatsoever; and
                  
                              b.    a Qualified Surgeon must always be physically in
                                    attendance when I am engaging in my practice as a
                                    surgical assistant.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sluzar, undertake that I will not engage in any practice of
                        medicine that is not expressly and specifically listed in section
                        (5)(b) above.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sluzar, undertake that should I seek privileges to perform
                        surgical assisting at any other Practice Location (other than Royal
                        Victoria Hospital), I shall advise the College within 14 days of
                        making such application, and shall seek approval to practice
                        surgical assist at that Practice Location at least 14 days before
                        commencing surgical assisting. For greater certainty, I shall not
                        commence surgical assisting at any other Practice Location (other
                        than Royal Victoria Hospital) without prior approval of the
                        College. 
                  
            (6)   Resumption of Anesthesia Practice

                  (a)   If I wish to return to the practice of anesthesia:
                  
                        i.    I, Dr. Sluzar, undertake to provide notice to the College of
                              my desire to return to the practice of anesthesia;
                  
                        ii.   I, Dr. Sluzar, acknowledge and agree that in order to resume
                              the practice of anaesthesiology, I shall, at a minimum, be
                              required to enter into a further undertaking with the College
                              which shall, at a minimum, require that:
                  
                              1.    I undergo a remediation program in anaesthesiology
                                    approved by the College, which may include a period of
                                    high-level supervision in which I shall not be the Most
                                    Responsible Physician; 
                  
                              2.    the remediation program will include, at a minimum,
                                    graduated supervision, specified education and an
                                    assessment including an observation component. 
                  
            (7)   Workplace Reporting 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sluzar, acknowledge and agree that the person who is the
                        Chief of Surgery at Royal Victoria Hospital, or other person
                        acceptable to the College (the "Hospital Monitor"), will be
                        required to execute an undertaking in the form attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A".  I have reviewed this undertaking and understand what
                        is required of the Hospital Monitor which includes, without
                        limiting the generality of the foregoing:
                  
                        i.    written reports to the College every three months for two
                              years;
                  
                        ii.   such reports to include information regarding my behaviour,
                              conduct, communications and professionalism, including
                              information provided to the Hospital Monitor by the OR Nurse
                              Manager and nursing and medical staff working directly with
                              me; and
                  
                        iii.  immediate reporting to the College if the Hospital Monitor
                              any concerns: about my conduct, behaviour, professionalism or
                              care; about my capacity to practice medicine; that my
                              patients may be at risk of harm or injury; or that I am not
                              in compliance with my Undertaking.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Sluzar, undertake that if I begin to practice at any Practice
                  Location other than Royal Victoria Hospital within two years of executing
                  this Undertaking, I will consent to the College obtaining an undertaking
                  in a similar form to that at Appendix "A" from a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities to the Chief of Surgery approved by the College.

            (9)   Compliance and Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sluzar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sluzar, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sluzar, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and/or patient charts by a College representative for the purposes
                        of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Sluzar, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Sluzar, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Sluzar, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Sluzar, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect. I acknowledge and agree that if the College approves
                  my practicing as a surgical assist at additional Practice Locations,
                  these Practice Locations will reflected on the public register. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Sluzar, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Sluzar was the subject of a College investigation into whether
                        he meets the standard of care and/or is incompetent in his
                        anesthesiology practice.  As a result of the investigation, Dr.
                        Sluzar may only practice as a surgical assistant under the
                        direction of a surgeon at Royal Victoria Hospital or other Practice
                        Locations as may be approved by the College.  Further, the College
                        will receive reports from Royal Victoria Hospital, or other
                        Practice Locations approved by the College, regarding Dr. Sluzar's
                        conduct in the work place. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Sluzar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Qualified Surgeon, Hospital Monitor and any Chief of
                  Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice
                  Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff
                  with any of the following: 

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking; 
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Sluzar, give my irrevocable consent to all Qualified Surgeons,
                  Hospital Monitors and all Chief(s) of Staff to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, all information relevant to this Undertaking and/or
                  relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Sluzar, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately and acknowledge that a breach by me of any
                  provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional
                  misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified
                  allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 28, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Markian Roman Sluzar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 28, 2016:

Dr. Sluzar was the subject of a College investigation into whether he meets the standard of care and/or is incompetent in his anesthesiology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Sluzar may only practice as a surgical assistant under the direction of a surgeon at Royal Victoria Hospital or other Practice Locations as may be approved by the College. Further, the College will receive reports from Royal Victoria Hospital, or other Practice Locations approved by the College, regarding Dr. Sluzar’s conduct in the work place.