Sluzar, Vladimir Stephen (CPSO#: 51784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 504
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 997-6144
Fax: (905) 997-6143
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vladimir Sluzar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sluzar ( CPSO# 51784 )

Business Address:
Suite 504
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 997-6144

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VLADIMIR STEPHEN SLUZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLUZAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1984