Smaill, Fiona Mary (CPSO#: 54429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Dept of Path & Molecular Medicine
Room 2N29
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 74190
Fax: (905) 521-2338
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fiona Smaill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Smaill ( CPSO# 54429 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 2N29
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 4J9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective: 30 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FIONA MARY SMAILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMAILL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1989