Smalley, Philip Stuart (CPSO#: 56875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ph 7
130 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5A 4K3
Phone: (416) 997-5285
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP STUART SMALLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1988