Smallman, Bettina (CPSO#: 64201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
State University of New York
Health Science Center
Department of Anaesthesia
750 East Adams Street
Syracuse NY  13210
United States
Phone: (315) 464-4720
Fax: (315) 464-4905

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETTINA SMALLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALLMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1997