Smallman, Julia Lynne (CPSO#: 66805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ministry of Health and Long Term
Care - Health Services Branch
Kingston ON  K7L 5T3
Phone: (613) 536-3086
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA LYNNE SMALLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALLMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Apr 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 May 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1997