Smart, Gavin Wynne (CPSO#: 54323)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Mar 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Dec 1988