Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Smieja, Marek Jozef (CPSO#: 60252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Laboratory Medicine L424
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6021
Fax: (905) 521-6083
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAREK JOZEF SMIEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMIEJA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1988