Smile, Sharon Carina (CPSO#: 86952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2012

Expiry Date:  12 Apr 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview Kids
Rehab Hospital
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Apr 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Apr 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sharon Carina Smile may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Smile holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Smile no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Smile's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Smile's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 13, 2012 and will expire on or before
                  April 12, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.