Smith, Andrew James (CPSO#: 62493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
C1-132
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4118
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1991