Smith, Andrew Joseph (CPSO#: 85632)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Sep 2008 to 05 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2008