Smith, Andrew Lawrence (CPSO#: 97992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  08 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: 613-562-5800 Ext. 1656
Fax: 613-562-5394
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW LAWRENCE SMITH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SMITH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. SMITH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SMITH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SMITH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SMITH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SMITH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 08 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jan 2018